Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0761 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 12, 2024

Analysis

Analysis May 7, 2024
Analysis March 13, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 28, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 25, 2024