House
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Favorable by Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Reported out of Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Favorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Added to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Now in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Reported out of Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
PCS added to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/19/2023
|
Now in Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/19/2023
|
Referred to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|