Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0767 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 6, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 26, 2024
Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 31, 2024