House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Reported out of Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
PCS added to Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2023
|
Now in Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2023
|
Referred to Water Quality, Supply & Treatment Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/07/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|