Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0789 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2024
Bill January 25, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024