|
06/27/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-268
|
|
|
|
06/26/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/17/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Substituted for CS/SB 814
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 113, NAYS 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Amendment 856091 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Favorable by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2024
|
Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2023
|
Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2023
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2023
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/08/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|