Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0799 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 8, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2024

Analysis

Analysis June 27, 2024
Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024