House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Original reference removed: Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/15/2024
|
Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2023
|
Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2023
|
Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/11/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|