Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0817 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 11, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 21, 2024
Bill January 16, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis January 15, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024