Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0867 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 7, 2024

Analysis

Analysis July 3, 2024
Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 10, 2024
Analysis January 8, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 23, 2024