House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Reported out of Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Favorable by Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Added to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Now in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2023
|
Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2023
|
Referred to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2023
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|