Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0869 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 13, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024
Analysis January 18, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024