House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2023
|
Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2023
|
Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|