Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0873 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 13, 2023

Analysis

Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 25, 2024