|
04/03/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-53
|
|
|
|
04/02/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/27/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 34 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Substituted for CS/CS/SB 962
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Amendment 366391 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/27/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Reported out of PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Added to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Reported out of Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Added to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2023
|
Now in Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2023
|
Referred to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|