Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0883 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 13, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 1, 2024

Analysis

Analysis April 3, 2024
Analysis March 26, 2024
Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 18, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 16, 2024
Bill January 18, 2024