House | 03/08/2024 | Died in Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Now in Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Reported out of PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Added to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Reported out of Education Quality Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Favorable by Education Quality Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Added to Education Quality Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/05/2024 | Now in Education Quality Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/05/2024 | Referred to Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 01/05/2024 | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/05/2024 | Referred to Education Quality Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/18/2023 | Filed |