Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0909 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 18, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 29, 2024
Analysis March 11, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 26, 2024