|
04/19/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-103
|
|
|
|
04/18/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/16/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed; YEAS 28 NAYS 12
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Substituted for CS/SB 1044
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 89, NAYS 25
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Amendment 893609 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Amendment 879021 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Amendment 186515 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Amendment 310623 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Amendment 812581 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Amendment 733109 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Amendment 033997 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/21/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Favorable by Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Reported out of Education Quality Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Favorable by Education Quality Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Added to Education Quality Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2024
|
Now in Education Quality Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2024
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2024
|
Referred to Education Quality Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/19/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|