Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0931 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 7, 2024

Analysis

Analysis April 23, 2024
Analysis March 26, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024