House
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Reported out of Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Added to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Now in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Favorable by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2024
|
Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2024
|
Referred to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2024
|
Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/19/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|