Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0943 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 19, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 3, 2024
Analysis March 18, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024
Analysis January 18, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 1, 2024
Bill January 25, 2024