House | 03/08/2024 | Died in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Added to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/05/2024 | Now in Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/05/2024 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/05/2024 | Referred to Ethics, Elections & Open Government Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/20/2023 | Filed |