Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1007 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 22, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 12, 2024

Analysis

Analysis April 29, 2024
Analysis March 21, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 26, 2024
Bill February 9, 2024