Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1013 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 22, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024