House
|
03/04/2024
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/29/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Original reference removed: Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Reported out of Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Added to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Now in Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Referred to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/28/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|