Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1051 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 28, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 7, 2024
Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 23, 2024
Bill January 25, 2024