Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1061 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 24, 2024
Bill February 15, 2024
Bill January 30, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024