Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1065 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 30, 2023

Enrolled

Bill February 29, 2024

Analysis

Analysis May 16, 2024
Analysis March 27, 2024
Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 23, 2024
Bill February 12, 2024
Bill January 30, 2024