|
03/22/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-34
|
|
|
|
03/22/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/21/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Substituted for CS/SB 1164
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/21/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2024
|
Reported out of Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Added to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Now in Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Referred to Transportation & Modals Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/02/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|