Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1113 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 2, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 4, 2024

Analysis

Analysis March 27, 2024
Analysis March 8, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 20, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 31, 2024
Bill January 22, 2024