Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1135 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 21, 2024
Bill January 19, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024