|
04/16/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-98
|
|
|
|
04/15/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/02/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Substituted for SB 1218
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Passed; YEAS 119, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/15/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Reported out of Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Favorable by Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Added to Ways & Means Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Now in Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Reported out of Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Favorable by Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Added to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Now in Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Referred to Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Referred to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|