Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1147 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/22/2024

                                    
ENROLLED 
HB 1147  	2024 Legislature 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb1147-01-er 
Page 1 of 1 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
 
 
      1 
An act relating to broadband; amending s. 288.9963, 2 
F.S.; extending the expiration date of a certain 3 
promotional rate; providing an effective date. 4 
 5 
Be It Enacted by the Legislature of the State of Florida: 6 
 7 
 Section 1.  Paragraph (e) of subsection (3) of section 8 
288.9963, Florida Statutes, is amended to read: 9 
 288.9963  Attachment of broadband facilities to municipal 10 
electric utility poles. — 11 
 (3)  Beginning July 1, 2021 , a broadband provider shall 12 
receive a promotional rate of $1 per wireline attachment per 13 
pole per year for any new attachment necessary to make broadband 14 
service available to an unserved or underserved end user within 15 
a municipal electric utility service territory for the time 16 
period specified in this subsection. 17 
 (e)  The promotional rate of $1 per wireline attachment per 18 
pole per year applies to all pole attachments made pursuant to 19 
this subsection until December 31, 2028 July 1, 2024. 20 
 Section 2.  This act shall take effect June 30, 2024. 21