Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Died in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 114, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Amendment 104477 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Reported out of Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Added to Infrastructure Strategies Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Now in Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred to Infrastructure Strategies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Reported out of Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Added to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Now in Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Referred to Agriculture, Conservation & Resiliency Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|