Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1165 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 7, 2024

Analysis

Analysis July 3, 2024
Analysis March 13, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 7, 2024
Bill February 1, 2024