House
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|