Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1167 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2024

Analysis

Analysis March 15, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 1, 2024