House
|
03/04/2024
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Favorable by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Original reference removed: Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|