Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1189 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2024

Analysis

Analysis March 11, 2024
Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 4, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 7, 2024