Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1195 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 29, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 7, 2024
Bill January 22, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024