House | 02/01/2024 | Adopted; YEAS 98, NAYS 15 | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/1/2024) | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Reported out of State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Favorable by State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Now in State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Filed |