Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1209 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/04/2024

                                
   
HR 1209  	2024 
 
 
 
 
hr1209-00 
Page 1 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
House Resolution 1 
A resolution to strongly encourage all executive 2 
agencies of the State of Florida, all law enforcement 3 
agencies, and all local governments in this state to 4 
suspend contact and outreach activities with the 5 
Council on American-Islamic Relations. 6 
 7 
 WHEREAS, the Federal Bureau of Investigation has suspended 8 
all formal contacts with the Council on American -Islamic 9 
Relations (CAIR) due to evidence demonstrating a relationship 10 
between CAIR and Hamas, designated as a foreign terrorist 11 
organization by the United States Department of State and the 12 
monsters behind the brutal attack on the State of Israel on 13 
October 7, 2023, indiscriminately raping, torturing, and kil ling 14 
over 1,200 innocent persons, including Israelis, Americans, and 15 
other nationals, among whom were babies and Holocaust survivors, 16 
and taking 240 Israelis, Americans, and other civilians as 17 
hostages, and 18 
 WHEREAS, since October 7, 2023, Hamas terrorists and their 19 
allies have launched over 11,500 rockets into southern and 20 
central Israel, the sole goal of which was to kill Israeli 21 
civilians and 22 
 WHEREAS, Hamas and Iranian leadership have called for the 23 
extermination of Israelis, Americans, Jews, and Christ ians 24      
   
HR 1209  	2024 
 
 
 
 
hr1209-00 
Page 2 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
around the world and the establishment of a global Islamic 25 
caliphate, and 26 
 WHEREAS, the stated goal of Hamas and its allies is the 27 
complete and total destruction of the State of Israel and the 28 
Jewish people, and 29 
 WHEREAS, in the federal criminal prose cutions of persons 30 
involved with the Holy Land Foundation for Relief and 31 
Development, the largest successful prosecution of terrorism 32 
financing in our country's history, CAIR was identified as an 33 
associate of the Muslim Brotherhood and was named an unindic ted 34 
co-conspirator in the trial, and 35 
 WHEREAS, CAIR, soon after opening its first office in 36 
Washington, D.C., received a grant from the Holy Land Foundation 37 
for Relief and Development, a charitable organization that was 38 
closed and was designated a Speciall y Designated Global 39 
Terrorist by the United States Department of the Treasury for 40 
funding jihadist terrorist organizations, and 41 
 WHEREAS, in 2009, Ghassan Elashi, who was a member of the 42 
founding board of directors of the Texas branch of CAIR and a 43 
leader of the Holy Land Foundation for Relief and Development, 44 
was sentenced to a total of 65 years in prison after being 45 
convicted of 10 counts of conspiracy to provide, and the 46 
provision of, material support to a designated foreign terrorist 47 
organization; 11 counts of conspiracy to provide, and the 48 
provision of, funds, goods, and services to a Specially 49      
   
HR 1209  	2024 
 
 
 
 
hr1209-00 
Page 3 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
Designated Terrorist as determined by the United States 50 
Secretary of the Treasury; 10 counts of conspiracy to commit, 51 
and the commission of, money laundering; 1 count of conspiracy 52 
to impede and impair the Internal Revenue Service; and 2 counts 53 
of filing a false tax return, and 54 
 WHEREAS, in October, 2000, at a large CAIR rally in 55 
Washington DC, featured speaker Abdurahman Alamoudi, later a 56 
convicted terrorist and Al Qaeda financier, publicly expressed 57 
support for both Hamas and Hezbollah as the crowd cheered him 58 
on, and 59 
 WHEREAS, Randall Todd Royer, also known as Ismail Royer, 60 
who served as a communications specialist and civil rights 61 
coordinator for CAIR and train ed with and set up an Internet -62 
based newsletter for Lashkar -e-Taiba, an al Qaeda-tied Kashmir 63 
organization that is listed on the United States Department of 64 
State's international terror list, was also indicted on charges 65 
of conspiring to help al Qaeda and the Taliban battle American 66 
troops fighting in Afghanistan and was sentenced to 20 years in 67 
prison on April 9, 2004, and 68 
 WHEREAS, in September 2003, CAIR's former community affairs 69 
director, Bassem Khafagi, pleaded guilty to 3 federal counts of 70 
bank and visa fraud, and agreed to be deported to Egypt after he 71 
had funneled money to activities supporting terrorism and had 72 
published material advocating suicide attacks against the United 73      
   
HR 1209  	2024 
 
 
 
 
hr1209-00 
Page 4 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
States, illegal activities that took place while he was employed 74 
by CAIR, and 75 
 WHEREAS, Rabih Haddad, the Ann Arbor, Michigan -based CAIR 76 
fundraiser, was arrested on terrorism -related charges and was 77 
deported from the United States due to his work as Executive 78 
Director of the Global Relief Foundation, which in October 2002 79 
was closed by the United States Department of the Treasury for 80 
financing al Qaeda and other terrorist organizations, and, 81 
 WHEREAS, in March 2011, Muthanna al -Hanooti, a director 82 
within CAIR, was sentenced to a year in federal prison for 83 
violating United States sanctions against Iraq under Saddam 84 
Hussein, and 85 
 WHEREAS, United States ally, the United Arab Emirates, 86 
officially designated CAIR as a terrorist organization in 2014, 87 
and 88 
 WHEREAS, in 2014, CAIR honored convicted terrorist and 89 
Palestinian Islamic Jihad f inancier Sami Al Arian and in 2020 90 
CAIR-Florida featured Al Arian in its livestream interview 91 
series. A former professor at the University of South Florida, 92 
Al Arian was convicted in 2006 of providing material support for 93 
a designated terrorist organizatio n, Palestinian Islamic Jihad, 94 
and was deported after serving his prison sentence, and 95 
 WHEREAS, Zainab Chaudry, Executive Director of the Council 96 
on American-Islamic Relations – Maryland Office, was suspended 97 
from the Maryland Commission on Hate Crimes Response and 98      
   
HR 1209  	2024 
 
 
 
 
hr1209-00 
Page 5 of 5 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
Prevention by Maryland's Attorney General on November 21, 2023, 99 
following multiple social media posts, including one comparing 100 
Israel to Nazi Germany with the comment, "That moment when you 101 
become what you hated most," and 102 
 WHEREAS, On November 24, 2023, Speaking at the American 103 
Muslims for Palestine convention in Chicago, CAIR Executive 104 
Director Nihad Awad proclaimed: "The people of Gaza only decided 105 
to break the siege, the walls of the concentration camp, on 106 
October 7. And yes, I was happy to see people breaking the siege 107 
and throwing down the shackles of their own land, and walk free 108 
into their land, which they were not allowed to walk in. And 109 
yes, the people of Gaza have the right to self -defense, have the 110 
right to defend themselves, and yes, Israel, as an occupying 111 
power, does not have that right to self -defense," NOW, 112 
THEREFORE, 113 
 114 
Be It Resolved by the House of Representatives of the State of 115 
Florida: 116 
 117 
 That all executive agencies of the State of Florida, all 118 
law enforcement agencies, and all local governments in this 119 
state are strongly encouraged to suspend contact and outreach 120 
activities with the Council on American -Islamic Relations. 121