Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1225 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024