House | 03/08/2024 | Died in Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Now in Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | CS Filed | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Reported out of Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Favorable with CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | PCS added to Civil Justice Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Now in Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/13/2024 | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Filed |