House
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Reported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|