Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1271 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Analysis

Analysis March 27, 2024
Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 23, 2024
Bill January 30, 2024
Bill January 24, 2024