Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1305 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2024

Analysis

Analysis May 22, 2024
Analysis March 12, 2024
Analysis February 9, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 9, 2024