|
05/13/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-178
|
|
|
|
05/10/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/25/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 102, NAYS 9
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Amendment 833732 Concur
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 29 NAYS 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (833732)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1544
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 110, NAYS 5
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/21/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Favorable with CS by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Favorable by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|