Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1335 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 14, 2024

Analysis

Analysis June 6, 2024
Analysis March 11, 2024
Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2024
Bill February 7, 2024